EP3895713 - METHODS FOR MOBILIZING STEM CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 19.09.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tzu Chi University No. 701, Sec. 3, Zhongyang Rd. Hualien City, Hualien County / TW | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Hsin-Hou 3F.-1, No. 16, Guofo 21st St., Hualien City 970 Hualien County / TW | 02 /
Sun, Der-Shan 3F.-1, No. 16, Guofo 21st St., Hualien City 970 Hualien County / TW | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/42] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 21164662.5 | 24.03.2021 | [2021/42] | Priority number, date | US202016848065 | 14.04.2020 Original published format: US202016848065 | [2021/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895713 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/28, A61K38/17, A61P7/00, C12N5/0789, A61P9/10 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
A61P1/16 (EP,CN);
A61K38/1709 (CN);
C12N5/0663 (US);
A61K35/28 (EP);
A61K38/178 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (CN);
A61K47/6911 (US);
A61P29/00 (CN);
A61P37/00 (CN);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1709, A61K2300/00 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2021/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MOBILISIERUNG VON STAMMZELLEN | [2021/42] | English: | METHODS FOR MOBILIZING STEM CELLS | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE MOBILISER DES CELLULES SOUCHES | [2021/42] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 12.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004094619 (XIA LIJUN [US], et al); | by applicant | US8377887 | US2018142211 |