EP3859742 - ACTIVITY AND WORKOUT UPDATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Aled, Hywel c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
GRAHAM, David, Chance c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
WILSON, Christopher c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 21165295.3 | 01.06.2017 | [2021/31] | Priority number, date | US201662348908P | 11.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662348908 P | DK2017PA70423 | 31.05.2017 Original published format: DK PA201770423 | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3859742 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/30, G16H40/67, A63B24/00, G06F3/038, G06F3/0481, A61B5/00, A61B5/11, G06F3/0485, G06K9/00, G06T11/60, G06F3/0488 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
A61B5/1118 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,CN,US);
A63B24/0062 (US);
A61B5/00 (US);
A61B5/0022 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/11 (US);
A61B5/6898 (EP,CN,US);
A63B24/0084 (US);
A63B71/0622 (US);
G06F3/04817 (CN);
G06F3/0482 (CN);
G06F3/04845 (CN,US);
G06F3/0485 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,CN,US);
G06T11/60 (EP,CN,US);
G06V40/23 (US);
G16H20/30 (EP,CN,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,CN,US);
G16H50/30 (EP,CN,US);
A63B2024/0068 (US);
A63B2071/0655 (US);
A63B2071/0691 (US);
A63B2220/12 (US);
A63B2220/20 (US);
A63B2220/40 (US);
A63B2220/62 (US);
A63B2220/805 (US);
A63B2220/806 (US);
A63B2220/807 (US);
A63B2225/50 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | AKTIVITÄTS- UND TRAININGSAKTUALISIERUNGEN | [2021/31] | English: | ACTIVITY AND WORKOUT UPDATES | [2021/31] | French: | MISES À JOUR D'ACTIVITÉS ET D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2021/31] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 18.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.04.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 31.05.2024 | Appeal received No. T1144/24 | 31.05.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 28.08.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17810749.6 / EP3448534 | Divisional application(s) | EP24179066.6 / EP4428870 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012290109 (ENGELBERG RICHARD J [US], et al) | by applicant | US6323846 | US2002015024 | US6570557 | US6677932 | US2005190059 | US2006017692 | US7657849 | WO2013169849 | WO2014105276 | US19620609365 | US20040840862 | US20040903964 | US20050038590 | US20050048264 | US20050228758 | US20050228700 | US20050228737 | US20050322549 | US20060367749 | US20060381313 | US20070968067 | US20080240788 | US20080241839 | US20090586862 | US20090620702 | US20090638251 | WO2013US40061 | WO2013US69483 |