EP3889759 - ENHANCED DATA COLLECTION AND GUI FOR PRODUCTION PRINT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 27.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome, 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHANI, Maryamossadat Nematollahi c/o Ricoh USA, Inc. 6300 Diagonal Highway Boulder, CO Colorado 80301-9270 / US | 02 /
IORDACHESCU, Vlad Alin c/o Ricoh USA, Inc. 6300 Diagonal Highway Boulder, CO Colorado 80301-9270 / US | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 21165479.3 | 29.03.2021 | [2021/40] | Priority number, date | US202016837238 | 01.04.2020 Original published format: US202016837238 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3889759 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/1219 (EP,US);
G06F3/1208 (US);
G06F3/04847 (US);
G06F3/1229 (EP);
G06F3/1256 (US);
G06F3/1285 (EP);
G06F3/12 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2021/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE DATENSAMMLUNG UND GUI FÜR EIN PRODUKTIONSDRUCKSYSTEM | [2021/40] | English: | ENHANCED DATA COLLECTION AND GUI FOR PRODUCTION PRINT SYSTEM | [2021/40] | French: | COLLECTE DE DONNÉES AMÉLIORÉE ET INTERFACE UTILISATEUR GRAPHIQUE POUR SYSTÈME D'IMPRESSION DE PRODUCTION | [2021/40] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 05.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09183232 (CANON KK); | [I]US9656463 (ERNST LARRY M [US], et al) |