EP3940267 - MULTI-POSITION CRANKSHAFT LIP SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Powerhouse Engine Solutions Switzerland IP Holding GmbH c/o Centralis Switzerland GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 10 6300 Zug / CH | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Namadev Kamble, Sandeep 560066 Bangalore / IN | 02 /
Mendoza, Michael Grove City, PA Pennsylvania 16127 / US | 03 /
Pethuraj, Kamala Hasan 560066 Bangalore / IN | 04 /
Roth, John Stephen Erie, PA Pennsylvania 16521 / US | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/35] | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2022/03] | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Marstallstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21165727.5 | 29.03.2021 | [2022/03] | Priority number, date | US202063052824P | 16.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063052824 P | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3940267 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3940267 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/3232, F16J15/3228, F16J15/3244, F16J15/3268, F16J15/3204, F16M1/021 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
F16J15/3204 (EP);
F02F11/007 (CN);
F02B23/00 (EA);
F16J15/322 (US);
F01M11/02 (US);
F02F11/00 (US);
F16J15/164 (US);
F16J15/3228 (EP);
F16J15/3232 (EP);
F16J15/324 (US);
F16J15/3244 (EP);
F16J15/3268 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | F16J15/3204, F16M1/021, F16F15/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] |
Former [2022/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KURBELWELLENLIPPENDICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN POSITIONEN | [2022/03] | English: | MULTI-POSITION CRANKSHAFT LIP SEAL | [2022/03] | French: | JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ À LÈVRE DE VILEBREQUIN MULTI-POSITION | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 19.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2003262275 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [X] 8-15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0034]; figure 6 * [A] 1-7; | [A]CN208051827U (SHAANXI COAL INDUSTRY COMPANY LTD SHENNAN INDUSTRY DEVELOPMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-15* See English description.;; figures 3-4; claim 1 *; | [XA]CN209041869U (ANHUI JIANGHUAI AUTOMOBILE GROUP CORP LTD) [X] 8-15 * figures 1-3, 5; claims 1, 7-8 * [A] 1-7; | [XA]CN210715938U (WUXI POWER ENG CO LTD) [X] 8-13,15 * figures 1-3; claim 5 * [A] 1-7,14 |