EP4068241 - DRIVING ASSISTANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING AUTONOMOUS VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Industry Software NV Interleuvenlaan 68 3001 Leuven / BE | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tong, Son 3001 Leuven / BE | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/40] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21165860.4 | 30.03.2021 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4068241 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, B60W30/14, B60W30/095 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
G08G1/166 (EP);
B60W30/0956 (EP);
B60W60/0011 (EP);
B60W60/00274 (EP);
G08G1/163 (EP);
B60W2555/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRERASSISTENZSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON AUTONOMEN FAHRZEUGEN | [2022/40] | English: | DRIVING ASSISTANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING AUTONOMOUS VEHICLES | [2022/40] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE À LA CONDUITE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULES AUTONOMES | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/38] | 02.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013054106 (SCHMUEDDERICH JENS [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0015] , [0036] - [0040] - [0047] , [0057] - [0059] - [0064] - [0065] - [0087] - [0088] * * paragraphs [0097] - [0100] - [0105] , [0107] - [0108] - [0112] - [0113] - [0117] , [0125] , [0136] , [0141] * * claims 2,15 * [I] 9; | [A]US2019243371 (NISTER DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-9,13* the whole document *; | [XAI]US2019291727 (SHALEV-SHWARTZ SHAI [IL], et al) [X] 10,11 * paragraphs [0080] , [0087] , [0192] , [0196] , [0197] , [0198] * * paragraphs [0220] , [0232] , [0235] , [0237] , [0261] , [0269] , [0281] , [0293] , [0297] * * paragraphs [0337] , [0341] , [0342] , [0345] , [0377] , [0395] , [0472] * [A] 1-9,13 [I] 12; | [XI]US2019384305 (NIIBO NANA [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,13 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0 65] , [0 69] , [0 79] , [0 89] - [0090] - [0 93] - [0094] - [0 99] * * paragraphs [0123] - [0124] - [ 158] , [ 172] , [ 173] , [ 182] , [ 195] * [I] 2-6,8,9 |