EP4068343 - DEVICE FOR TRANSPORTING SEMICONDUCTOR WAFERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siltronic AG Einsteinstraße 172 Tower B / Blue Tower 81677 München / DE | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lamprecht, Ludwig 83376 Truchtlaching / DE | 02 /
Vogel, Thoralf 09514 Lengefeld / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 21166539.3 | 01.04.2021 | [2022/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4068343 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/673 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
H01L21/6733 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/67366 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/67379 (KR);
H01L21/67383 (KR,US);
H01L21/67772 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] |
Former [2022/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRANSPORT VON HALBLEITERSCHEIBEN | [2022/40] | English: | DEVICE FOR TRANSPORTING SEMICONDUCTOR WAFERS | [2022/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT DES VITRES À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 31.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE4223326 (FLUOROWARE INC [US]); | [A]US2001042439 (ROBERSON GLENN A [US], et al); | [AD]WO2004005163 (ENTEGRIS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2004050218 (DAINICHI SHOJI K K [JP], et al); | [A]US2018056291 (BORES GREGORY [US]); | [T]US2021143040 (STEFFENS JASON T [US], et al) | by applicant | DE4223326 | WO2004005163 | US2004206663 | US2005236110 | US2015104276 |