EP3892311 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR NERVE REGENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Integra LifeSciences Corporation 1100 Campus Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'BRIEN, Fergal Dublin / IE | 02 /
HIBBITTS, Alan Kildare / IE | 03 /
ARCHIBALD, Simon James Pennington, 08534 / US | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 21166773.8 | 01.04.2021 | [2021/41] | Priority number, date | US202063005585P | 06.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063005585 P | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892311 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3892311 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/26, A61L27/56 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
A61L27/56 (EP);
A61L27/3675 (US);
A61L27/225 (US);
A61L27/24 (US);
A61L27/26 (EP);
A61L27/3683 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/26, C08L5/08 (EP);
A61L27/26, C08L89/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] |
Former [2021/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR NERVENREGENERATION | [2021/41] | English: | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR NERVE REGENERATION | [2021/41] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉGÉNÉRATION NERVEUSE | [2021/41] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 04.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2023 | CZ | 20.09.2023 | EE | 20.09.2023 | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | NL | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SE | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | PT | 22.01.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2019357910 (ARCHIBALD SIMON J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-17 * claim 20 *; | [A] - DING TAN ET AL, "Rapid repair of rat sciatic nerve injury using a nanosilver-embedded collagen scaffold coated with laminin and fibronectin", REGENERATIVE MEDICINE, FUTURE MEDICINE LTD, GB, vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.2217/RME.11.39, ISSN 1746-0751, (20110701), pages 437 - 447, (20110712), XP009526896 [A] 1-18 * methods - preparation of nano-silver collagen scaffold; page 439 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2217/rme.11.39 | by applicant | US4955893 | US5019087 | US2011129515 | WO2018102812 |