EP3889486 - GRABBING MEMBER FOR QUICK-COUPLING SAFETY JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pres-Block S.P.A. Via Alpignano, 155 10040 Caselette / IT | [2024/22] |
Former [2021/40] | For all designated states Pres-Block S.P.A. Via Alpignano, 155 10040 Caselette / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTAGONO, Massimiliano 10040 CASELETTE (TO) / IT | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2024/22] |
Former [2021/40] | D'Angelo, Fabio, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 21166813.2 | 02.04.2021 | [2021/40] | Priority number, date | IT20200006985 | 02.04.2020 Original published format: IT202000006985 | [2021/40] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3889486 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3889486 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/22, F16L37/44 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
F16L37/22 (EP);
F16L37/44 (EP);
F16L2201/20 (EP);
F16L37/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] |
Former [2021/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GREIFELEMENT FÜR SCHNELLKUPPELNDE SICHERHEITSVERBINDUNG | [2021/40] | English: | GRABBING MEMBER FOR QUICK-COUPLING SAFETY JOINT | [2021/40] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE PRÉHENSION POUR JOINT DE SÉCURITÉ À COUPLAGE RAPIDE | [2021/40] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 18.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2741512 (SCHILDMANN KURT) [A] 1-10 * page 6 - page 9; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5240023 (SHELEF GAD [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 2, line 66 - column 6, line 24; figures 2-9 *; | [Y]EP1455131 (PRES BLOCK SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0012] - [0068]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP2369214 (FASTER SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] - [0017] - [0026]; figures 1,2,6A,6B * |