EP3896485 - ON-BOARD SENSOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN 471-8571 / JP | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAKAWA, Takeshi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
UEHARA, Yasuo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
KOMEDA, Osamu c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
HIRAMOTO, Kazuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
MIYAZATO, Kazuhiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | 06 /
CHIBA, Masamu c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | 07 /
UCHIDA, Naohide c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | 08 /
SAWADA, Hideaki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | 09 /
IKAI, Masaki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 21166856.1 | 02.04.2021 | [2021/42] | Priority number, date | JP20200071587 | 13.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020071587 | [2021/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3896485 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/86, G01S13/87, G01S13/931, G01S17/86, G01S17/87, G01S17/931, G01S7/40, G01S7/41, G01S7/48 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
G01S13/931 (EP);
G08G1/16 (BR,RU);
B60R21/00 (RU);
B60W40/02 (KR);
G08G1/167 (CN,KR);
B60W30/0956 (US);
B60R21/0134 (KR);
G01S13/86 (EP,RU);
G01S13/865 (EP);
G01S13/867 (EP);
G01S13/87 (EP);
G01S13/93 (RU);
G01S17/86 (EP);
G01S17/87 (EP);
G01S17/931 (EP);
G01S7/32 (RU);
G01S7/4026 (EP);
G01S7/41 (RU);
G01S7/411 (EP);
G01S7/415 (EP);
G01S7/4802 (EP);
G08G1/165 (CN);
G08G1/166 (CN,KR);
B60W2050/009 (KR);
B60W2420/403 (KR);
B60W2420/408 (KR,US);
B60W2552/10 (US);
B60W2552/50 (KR);
B60W2552/53 (KR);
B60W2554/4029 (KR,US);
B60Y2400/30 (KR);
G01S2013/9315 (EP);
G01S2013/932 (EP);
G01S2013/9322 (EP);
G01S2013/93271 (EP);
G01S2013/93272 (EP);
G01S2013/93274 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BORDEIGENES SENSORSYSTEM | [2021/42] | English: | ON-BOARD SENSOR SYSTEM | [2021/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CAPTEUR EMBARQUÉ | [2021/42] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 11.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102012200975 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [XI]US2019277962 (INGRAM BENJAMIN [US], et al); | [XI]EP3623844 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) | by applicant | JPH10246778 | JP2017207348 |