EP4070942 - METHOD FOR CREATING AND VERIFYING A PROGRAM FOR CONTROLLING THE COMPONENTS OF A MULTI-DISC POWDER PRESS USING NUMERICAL CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osterwalder AG Industriering 4 3250 Lyss / CH | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peter, KUNZ 2558 Aegerten / DE | 02 /
Reto, KÜHNI 3075 Rüfenacht / DE | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 21166942.9 | 06.04.2021 | [2022/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070942 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B30B11/00 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
B30B11/005 (EP);
B30B9/28 (US);
B22F3/03 (US);
B28B17/0081 (US);
B28B3/04 (US);
B30B15/0041 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERSTELLEN UND VERIFIZIEREN EINES PROGRAMMS ZUM STEUERN DER KOMPONENTEN EINER MEHRPLATTEN-PULVERPRESSE UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER NUMERISCHEN STEUERUNG | [2022/41] | English: | METHOD FOR CREATING AND VERIFYING A PROGRAM FOR CONTROLLING THE COMPONENTS OF A MULTI-DISC POWDER PRESS USING NUMERICAL CONTROL | [2022/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CRÉATION ET DE VÉRIFICATION D'UN PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE DES COMPOSANTS D'UNE PRESSE À POUDRE POUR PLAQUES MULTIPLES À L'AIDE D'UNE COMMANDE NUMÉRIQUE | [2022/41] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/38] | 08.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0557496 (FANUC LTD); | [A]US5476631 (BROWN RICHARD S [US], et al); | [XA]JP2009006352 (NANYO KK); | [X]DE102007041181 (DORST TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO [DE]); | [XYI]JP2011235349 (MITSUBISHI MAT TECHNO CORP); | [A]DE202015103051U (KORSCH AG [DE]); | [Y]JP2018008280 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]DE202017102575U (KORSCH AG [DE]) | by applicant | EP1439949 | DE102010044688 |