EP3909603 - GLYCOTARGETING THERAPEUTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecole Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne (EPFL) EPFL-TTO EPFL Innovation Park J 1015 Lausanne / CH | For all designated states Anokion SA EPFL Innovation Park En Ruchoz Chemin De La Dent D'Oche 1A 1024 Ecublens / CH | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBBELL, Jeffrey A. Chicago, IL 60615-1915 / US | 02 /
KONTOS, Stephane 1022 Chavannes-pres-Renens / CH | 03 /
LORENTZ, Kristen Marie 1022 Chavannes-pres-Renens / CH | 04 /
WILSON, David Scott Chicago, IL 60601 / US | 05 /
GAI, Shuning 1196 Gland / CH | [2021/46] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 21167047.6 | 20.02.2015 | [2021/46] | Priority number, date | US201461942942P | 21.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461942942 P | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909603 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K47/00, A61K38/28, A61K38/38, A61K39/35, A61K47/54, A61P37/02, A61P37/06, A61P37/08 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
A61K38/38 (EP,IL,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/001 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/35 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61K39/385 (IL,US);
A61K47/549 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/555 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P37/02 (EP,KR);
A61P37/06 (EP,KR);
A61P37/08 (EP,KR);
A61K2039/555 (IL,US);
A61K2039/577 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/60 (IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/6093 (IL,US);
A61K2039/627 (IL,KR,US);
C07K2319/01 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] |
Former [2021/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GLYCOTARGETING-THERAPEUTIKA | [2021/46] | English: | GLYCOTARGETING THERAPEUTICS | [2021/46] | French: | AGENTS THÉRAPEUTIQUES DE GLYCOCIBLAGE | [2021/46] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 13.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15744656.8 / EP3107563 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2011086143 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO2011154887 (ASSIST PUBL HOPITAUX DE PARIS [FR], et al); | [Y]WO2012083185 (ARROWHEAD RES CORPORATIONS [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013121296 (ECOLE POLYTECH [CH]); | [XI]WO2014023709 (ROCHE GLYCART AG [CH]); | by applicant | US2012039989 | US2012178139 | US2013078216 | WO2013121296 |