EP3878261 - METHOD OF MONITORING AN AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Climate LLC 4 City Place, Suite 100 St. Louis, Missouri 63141 / US | [2023/04] |
Former [2022/25] | For all designated states Climate LLC 201 Third Street Suite 1050 San Francisco CA 94103 / US | ||
Former [2021/37] | For all designated states The Climate Corporation 201 Third Street, Suite 1100 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koch, Justin Morton, IL 61550 / US | 02 /
Sauder, Doug Livermore, CA 94550 / US | 03 /
Sauder, Tim Tremont, IL 51568 / US | 04 /
Stuber, Jakob Tremont, IL 61568 / US | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2024/32] |
Former [2021/37] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 21167413.0 | 12.08.2013 | [2021/37] | Priority number, date | US201261682074P | 10.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261682074 P | US201261738292P | 17.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261738292 P | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3878261 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3878261 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01C21/00, A01B79/00, G09B29/00, G01C15/00, G06F16/29 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
A01C21/005 (EP,US);
A01B79/005 (EP,US);
A01C21/00 (US);
G01C15/00 (EP,US);
G06F16/29 (EP,US);
G07C5/085 (US);
G09B29/007 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] |
Former [2021/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEM ARBEITSGERÄT | [2024/18] | English: | METHOD OF MONITORING AN AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT | [2021/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE D'OUTIL AGRICOLE | [2024/18] |
Former [2021/37] | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN ANWENDUNGEN | ||
Former [2021/37] | PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE D'APPLICATIONS AGRICOLES | Examination procedure | 09.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 15.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13828446.8 / EP2883020 | EP18159551.3 / EP3351082 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JPH04335390 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [A]WO9822887 (CASE CORP [US]); | [Y]US6070539 (FLAMME DAVID D [US], et al); | [XI]US2004158403 (DABAS MICHEL [FR], et al) | by applicant | US6389999 | US2010162931 | US2010180695 | US2012050023 | WO2014018717 |