EP3892568 - ONE-PIECE SAFETY TUBE CLOSURE WITH FILM ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karam, Jean-Pierre R. 347 Voorhis Avenue Wyckoff, NJ New Jersey 07481 / US | 02 /
Reichenbach, Judith A. 17 Van Dyk Place Pompton Plains, NJ New Jersey 07444 / US | 03 /
Russ, Craig Owen 36 Briarwood Road Wayne, NJ New Jersey 07470 / US | 04 /
Wilkinson, Bradley M. 39 Hillside Drive North Haledon, NJ New Jersey 07508 / US | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 21168264.6 | 06.08.2015 | [2021/41] | Priority number, date | US201414454232 | 07.08.2014 Original published format: US201414454232 | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892568 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/00, B01L3/00, A61B5/15 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
A61B5/150351 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/150259 (EP,CN,US);
B65D39/0052 (CN,US);
A61B5/15003 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/154 (EP,CN,US);
B01L3/50825 (EP,CN,US);
B29C65/70 (CN,US);
B65D51/002 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2200/0689 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2021/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINTEILIGER SICHERHEITSTUBENVERSCHLUSS MIT FILMELEMENT | [2021/41] | English: | ONE-PIECE SAFETY TUBE CLOSURE WITH FILM ELEMENT | [2021/41] | French: | FERMETURE DE TUBE DE SÉCURITÉ MONOBLOC DOTÉE D'UN ÉLÉMENT FILM | [2021/41] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 12.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15753801.8 / EP3177542 | EP19197574.7 / EP3608256 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6382441 (CARANO DONALD J [US]) [Y] 1,6-9 * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 14; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2009035685 (NOMACORC LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1,6-9* page 16, line 17 - line 20; figure 1 * |