EP4074660 - PROCESS FOR MAKING AN ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, AND ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TER MAAT, Johan 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
KURZHALS, Philipp 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
RIEWALD, Felix Florian 72072 Tuebingen / DE | 04 /
SOMMER, Heino 72072 Tuebingen / DE | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 21168417.0 | 14.04.2021 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4074660 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C01G53/04, H01M4/00 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
C01G53/04 (EP);
H01M4/131 (EP);
H01M4/1391 (EP);
H01M4/366 (EP);
H01M4/505 (EP);
H01M4/525 (EP);
H01M4/62 (EP);
C01P2002/52 (EP);
C01P2002/54 (EP);
C01P2004/62 (EP);
C01P2006/12 (EP);
C01P2006/40 (EP);
H01M4/625 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIALS SOWIE ELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIAL | [2022/42] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING AN ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, AND ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL | [2022/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE ET MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE | [2022/42] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2020148104 (BASF SE [DE]) [I] 1-8,11 * page 2 - page 7; example -; claim - *; | [XI] - Z. REN ET.AL., "Improving LiNi0.9Co0.08Mn0.02O2 cyclic stability via abating mechanical damages", ENERGY STORAGE MATERIALS, vol. 28, (20200228), pages 1 - 9, URL: https://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S2405829720300763/pdfft?md5=379f48d46e488bbe3443ec1fa457e694&pid=1-s2.0-S2405829720300763-main.pdf, XP055846351 [X] 9,11,12,14,15 * page 3 - page 5 * * page 7 - page 8; figure - * [I] 10,13 | [XI] - IDRIS MOHD SOBRI, "The Existing of Oxygen Nonstoichiometry in Complex Lithium Oxides", ADVANCED MATERIALS RESEARCH, vol. 795, doi:10.4028/www.scientific.net/AMR.795.438, (20130101), pages 438 - 440, URL: https://www.researchgate.net/profile/Mohd-Sobri-Idris/publication/271996940_The_Existing_of_Oxygen_Nonstoichiometry_in_Complex_Lithium_Oxides/links/552b22070cf2e089a3aa297f/The-Existing-of-Oxygen-Nonstoichiometry-in-Complex-Lithium-Oxides.pdf, XP055846454 [X] 9,11,12 * page 439 * [I] 10,13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4028/www.scientific.net/AMR.795.438 | [A] - ZHANG XIANHUI ET AL, "Electrolyte Regulating toward Stabilization of Cobalt-Free Ultrahigh-Nickel Layered Oxide Cathode in Lithium-Ion Batteries", ACS ENERGY LETTERS, (20210409), vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1021/acsenergylett.1c00374, ISSN 2380-8195, pages 1324 - 1332, XP055846449 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsenergylett.1c00374 | by applicant | JP4789066B | JP5139024B | US8993051 | US2015372300 |