EP3889688 - MOTOR MEMBER FOR A TIMEPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT, SI | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richemont International SA Route des Biches 10 1752 Villars-sur-Glâne / CH | [2023/17] |
Former [2021/40] | For all designated states Richemont International S.A. 10, route des Biches 1752 Villars-sur-Glâne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARQUET, Gilles 74350 Menthonnex-en-Bornes / FR | 02 /
GRIVET, Fabien 25300 Doubs / FR | 03 /
BELO, Vasco 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | 04 /
HERRERA, Bruno 01210 Ornex / FR | 05 /
VAN STRAATEN, Matthijs 1822 Chernex / CH | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | e-Patent SA Rue Saint-Maurice 12 Case postale 2001 Neuchâtel 1 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | e-Patent SA Rue Saint-Honoré 1 Case postale 2510 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 21168538.3 | 17.05.2017 | [2021/40] | Priority number, date | CH20160000698 | 01.06.2016 Original published format: CH 6982016 | [2021/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3889688 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3889688 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G04B1/14, G04B1/16, G04B1/18, G04B33/14 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
G04B1/16 (EP,CH);
G04B1/14 (EP);
G04B1/18 (EP);
G04B33/06 (CH);
G04B33/14 (EP,CH);
G04B29/022 (CH)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] |
Former [2021/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSORGAN FÜR UHR | [2021/40] | English: | MOTOR MEMBER FOR A TIMEPIECE | [2021/40] | French: | ORGANE MOTEUR POUR PIÈCE D'HORLOGERIE | [2021/40] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 27.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17171580.8 / EP3252540 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | IE | 17.05.2023 | LU | 17.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
IE | 17.05.2023 | ||
LU | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
LU | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
LU | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
LU | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH46863 (MAIRE FAVRE E [CH]) [A] 1-14 * figure 2 *; | [A]CH334702 (ROLEX MONTRES [CH]) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 17 - page 2, line 3; figures 2-4 *; | [A]FR2229087 (EBAUCHES SA [CH]) [A] 1-14 * page 1, lines 18-3 - page 2, line 3; figures 1,3; claims 1,5 *; | [A]US4117664 (MATHYS PIERRE) [A] 9,10 * column 1, lines 21-37; figures 1,2a,2b,3 *; | [A]EP2577404 (ASS SUISSE POUR LA RECH HORLOGERE [CH]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0016]; figure 6 *; | [A]EP3021172 (MONTRES BREGUET SA [CH]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0023] - [0024]; figure 2 * | Examination | CH705491 | EP2577404 | EP2437125 | by applicant | CH26510 | CH28684 | CH46863 | CH334702 | FR2229087 |