EP4074976 - A DEBRIS TRAP FOR CAPTURING DEBRIS FLOWING IN A STREAM OF LIQUID AND PRIMING ASSEMBLY FOR A PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer Management AG Neuwiesenstrasse 15 8401 Winterthur / CH | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haime, Kai 49220 Siltakylä / FI | 02 /
Heikkilä, Toni 48600 Kotka / FI | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | IPS Irsch AG Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 21168863.5 | 16.04.2021 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4074976 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F04D9/00, F04D9/06, F04D29/70 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
F04D29/708 (EP,CN,US);
F04D29/4293 (US);
F04D9/006 (EP);
F04D9/046 (US);
F04D9/06 (EP);
F04D9/065 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] |
Former [2022/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMUTZFÄNGER ZUM AUFFANGEN VON IN EINEM FLÜSSIGKEITSSTROM FLIESSENDEM SCHMUTZ UND ANSAUGANORDNUNG FÜR EINE PUMPE | [2022/42] | English: | A DEBRIS TRAP FOR CAPTURING DEBRIS FLOWING IN A STREAM OF LIQUID AND PRIMING ASSEMBLY FOR A PUMP | [2022/42] | French: | PIÈGE À DÉBRIS POUR CAPTURER DES DÉBRIS S'ÉCOULANT DANS UN FLUX DE LIQUIDE ET ENSEMBLE D'AMORÇAGE POUR POMPE | [2022/42] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 19.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1157767 (H J GODWIN LTD) [A] 1-15* column 2, lines 67-72; figure 1 *; | [A]US4116582 (SLOAN ALBERT H) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 12; figure 6 *; | [A]EP1024293 (GODWIN PUMPS LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] , [0017] , [0031]; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP2481928 |