EP3869853 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR SELF-CONTAINED AIR INTERFACE PARTITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Jianglei Ontario, K2M 2W5 / CA | 02 /
RONG, Lu Shanghai, 201206 / CN | 03 /
AU, Kelvin Kar Kin Ontario, K2M 0A2 / CA | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/34] | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21169080.5 | 07.11.2016 | [2021/34] | Priority number, date | US201562252037P | 06.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562252037 P | US201615140044 | 27.04.2016 Original published format: US201615140044 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3869853 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/00, H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04W76/15, H04L1/18 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04W72/0453 (CN,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0055 (CN);
H04L5/0092 (EP,US);
H04W72/1263 (US);
H04W72/21 (CN);
H04W72/23 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR AUTONOME LUFTSCHNITTSTELLENABSCHNITTE | [2021/34] | English: | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR SELF-CONTAINED AIR INTERFACE PARTITIONS | [2021/34] | French: | APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PARTITIONS D'INTERFACE HERTZIENNE AUTONOME | [2021/34] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 25.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16861630.8 / EP3360367 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015256308 (MA JIANGLEI [CA], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0030] * * figures 1,5 *; | [A] - HUAWEI, "PDCCH design for carrier aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090815, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090203), no. Athens, Greece; 20090203, XP050318672 [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 1 * * figure 1 * |