EP3904783 - FACILITY FOR HEATING DOMESTIC HOT WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Industrielle des Chauffe-Eau 2 Rue du Docteur Hurst 68300 Saint-Louis / FR | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURDIN, Yvan 90110 SAINT-GERMAIN-LE-CHATELET / FR | 02 /
ANTOINE, Florian 90000 BELFORT / FR | 03 /
GEOFFROY, Cédric 68700 CERNAY / FR | [2021/44] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [2024/35] |
Former [2021/44] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21170499.4 | 26.04.2021 | [2021/44] | Priority number, date | FR20200004339 | 30.04.2020 Original published format: FR 2004339 | [2021/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3904783 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3904783 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24H4/04, F24H9/02 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
F24H4/04 (EP);
F24H9/02 (EP);
Y02B30/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] |
Former [2021/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BRAUCHWASSER-HEIZANLAGE | [2021/44] | English: | FACILITY FOR HEATING DOMESTIC HOT WATER | [2021/44] | French: | INSTALLATION DE CHAUFFAGE D'EAU CHAUDE SANITAIRE | [2021/44] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 29.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2015004101 (TECUMSEH EUROPE SA [FR]); | [A]US2016109156 (YIN JIANMIN [US]); | [XI]EP3091305 (ATLANTIC CLIMATISATION ET VENTILATION [FR]) |