EP3919925 - COST-EFFECTIVE AND PRECISE DETERMINATION OF THE DEGRADATION OF A RECHARGEABLE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simonis, Christian 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Woll, Christoph 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 03 /
Kupcsik, Andras Gabor 71034 Boeblingen / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 21170576.9 | 27.04.2021 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | DE202010206915 | 03.06.2020 Original published format: DE102020206915 | [2021/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919925 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3919925 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/367, G01R31/392, H01M10/44, H01M10/42, H01M10/48, // B60L58/16 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
G01R31/367 (EP,US);
B60L58/16 (EP,CN);
G01R31/3842 (US);
G01R31/392 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H01M10/44 (EP,CN);
H01M10/48 (EP);
B60L2240/545 (EP);
B60L2240/547 (EP);
B60L2240/549 (EP);
G01R31/374 (EP);
H01M2010/4271 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | G01R31/367, G01R31/392, // B60L58/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] |
Former [2021/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOSTENGÜNSTIGE UND DENNOCH GENAUE ERMITTLUNG DES DEGRADATIONSZUSTANDES EINER WIEDERAUFLADBAREN BATTERIE | [2021/49] | English: | COST-EFFECTIVE AND PRECISE DETERMINATION OF THE DEGRADATION OF A RECHARGEABLE BATTERY | [2021/49] | French: | DÉTERMINATION ÉCONOMIQUE ET TOUJOURS PRÉCISE DE L'ÉTAT DE DÉGRADATION D'UNE BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 08.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | EP2852848 |