EP3892273 - COMBINATION PRODUCTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF RSV [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Sciences Ireland Unlimited Company Barnahely Ringaskiddy, Co Cork / IE | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YSEBAERT, Nina 2930 Brasschaat / BE | 02 /
GOEYVAERTS, Nele Isa E. 3511 Kuringen / BE | 03 /
ROYMANS, Dirk André Emmy 2300 Turnhout / BE | 04 /
KOUL, Anil 2650 Edegem / BE | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Verberckmoes, Filip Gerard Johnson & Johnson Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 21170919.1 | 02.02.2017 | [2021/41] | Priority number, date | EP20160154035 | 03.02.2016 Original published format: EP 16154035 | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3892273 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3892273 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/437, A61K31/7056, A61P31/12, A61K39/395, A61K31/41, A61K31/4184, A61K31/52, A61K31/53, A61K31/5377, A61K31/55, A61K31/5513, A61K31/70, A61K31/519, A61K31/4745, A61K31/496, A61P31/14, C07K16/10 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/41 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/52 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/53 (EP,EA,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,EA,US);
A61K31/5513 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,EA,US);
A61K31/7056 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,CN,EA,IL,US);
A61K39/42 (IL,US);
A61P11/00 (CN);
A61P31/12 (EA,KR);
A61P31/14 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07K16/10 (IL);
C07K16/1027 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2039/505 (IL,US);
A61K2300/00 (IL)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4184, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/41, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/437, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/52, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/5377, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/53, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/5513, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/55, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7056, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] |
Former [2021/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 22.06.2022 | ME | 22.06.2022 | Validation states | MA | 22.06.2022 | MD | 22.06.2022 | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSPRODUKTE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON RSV | [2021/41] | English: | COMBINATION PRODUCTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF RSV | [2021/41] | French: | PRODUITS DE COMBINAISON POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE RSV | [2021/41] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 22.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/38] | 21.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17702125.0 / EP3411028 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]WO2012080447 (JANSSEN R & D IRELAND [IE], et al); | [A]WO2014174018 (CRUCELL HOLLAND BV [NL]); | [AP]WO2016055791 (PULMOCIDE LTD [GB]); | by applicant | WO2012080447 |