EP3915594 - STERILIZATION TOOL FOR DENTAL AND MEDICAL TOOLS AND RELATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lazurtec, Inc. 3847 East Ivyglen Circle Mesa, AZ 85205 / US | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEBRAY, Jean-Philippe Mesa, Arizona, 85207 / US | 02 /
ARENA, Chantal San Jose, California, 95131 / US | 03 /
FOSTER, Robert Mesa, Arizona, 85205 / US | [2021/48] | Representative(s) | IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 21170933.2 | 28.04.2021 | [2021/48] | Priority number, date | US202063021529P | 07.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063021529 P | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3915594 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/10 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
A61L2/10 (EP);
A61L2/0047 (US);
A61L2/26 (US);
A61L2202/122 (EP,US);
A61L2202/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STERILISATIONSWERKZEUG FÜR ZAHNÄRZTLICHE UND MEDIZINISCHE WERKZEUGE UND VERWANDTE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2021/48] | English: | STERILIZATION TOOL FOR DENTAL AND MEDICAL TOOLS AND RELATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2021/48] | French: | OUTIL DE STÉRILISATION POUR OUTILS DENTAIRES ET MÉDICAUX ET SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 02.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/45] | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013004367 (ROBERTS JON L [US]) [X] 1-5,10,11,13-15 * claims 1,5,10 * * figure 4 * [I] 6-9; | [XPI]US10874754 (BOYSSET MAX [CH], et al) [XP] 1-5,12-14 * claims 1,17 * * paragraph [0176] - paragraph [0177] * * figures 3, 11 * [I] 6-9; | [AP]WO2021067809 (PURACATH MEDICAL INC [US]) [AP] 6-9 * claim 1 ** figure 6 * |