EP4000526 - CT SYSTEM WITH A COLLIMATOR PLATE AND METHOD FOR FIXING A COLLIMATOR PLATE OF A CT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthineers AG Siemensstraße 3 91301 Forchheim / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2022/21] | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berner, Matthias 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 02 /
Fehre, Jens 91353 Hausen / DE | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Siemens Healthineers Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/17] | Siemens Healthineers Patent Attorneys Siemens Healthcare GmbH SHS TE IP Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 21171216.1 | 29.04.2021 | [2022/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000526 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4000526 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/06, A61B6/03, A61B6/00 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
A61B6/06 (EP,CN);
A61B6/035 (EP,CN);
A61B6/03 (EP);
A61B6/40 (CN);
A61B6/4208 (CN);
A61B6/4405 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] |
Former [2022/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | CT-ANLAGE MIT EINEM KOLLIMATORBLECH UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINES KOLLIMATORBLECHS EINER CT-ANLAGE | [2022/21] | English: | CT SYSTEM WITH A COLLIMATOR PLATE AND METHOD FOR FIXING A COLLIMATOR PLATE OF A CT SYSTEM | [2022/21] | French: | INSTALLATION CT DOTÉE D'UNE TÔLE DE COLLIMATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION D'UNE TÔLE DE COLLIMATEUR D'UNE INSTALLATION CT | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 24.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4361902 (BRANDT RICHARD T, et al); | [X]JP2011152411 (MORITA MFG); | [Y]CN205433722U (SHANGHAI UNITED IMAGING HEALTHCARE CO LTD); | [X]US2017332988 (TSUJII OSAMU [JP], et al) |