EP3905303 - ETCHING APPARATUS AND ETCHING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokyo Electron Limited 3-1, Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-6325 / JP | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Torii, Natsumi Kurokawa-gun, 981-3629 / JP | 02 /
Nagami, Koichi Kurokawa-gun, 981-3629 / JP | 03 /
Masuda, Noriiki Kurokawa-gun, 981-3629 / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Takayuki Kurokawa-gun, 981-3629 / JP | [2021/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 21171520.6 | 30.04.2021 | [2021/44] | Priority number, date | JP20200081108 | 01.05.2020 Original published format: JP 2020081108 | JP20200149019 | 04.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020149019 | JP20200170061 | 07.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020170061 | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3905303 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
H01J37/32642 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01J37/32183 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32082 (EP);
H01J37/32174 (EP);
H01J37/3244 (US);
H01J37/32577 (EP);
H01J37/32623 (EP);
H01J37/32715 (CN,KR,US);
H01J37/32834 (US);
H01L21/3065 (CN,US);
H01L21/67069 (CN,KR,US);
H01L21/6831 (US);
H01L21/68721 (US);
H01J2237/2007 (US);
H01J2237/334 (CN,US);
H01J2237/3341 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÄTZVORRICHTUNG UND ÄTZVERFAHREN | [2021/44] | English: | ETCHING APPARATUS AND ETCHING METHOD | [2021/44] | French: | APPAREIL DE GRAVURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE GRAVURE | [2021/44] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 12.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2008241420 (DHINDSA RAJINDER [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0017] - [0039]; figures 1,2,3,4; claim 1 * [A] 2,17 [I] 3-16; | [AD]US2009026170 (TANAKA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-17* paragraphs [0059] - [0063]; figure 6a *; | [IA]US7572737 (DHINDSA RAJINDER [US]) [I] 1,3-16 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 14; figure 3a * * column 3, lines 45-53 * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 25; claim 1 * [A] 2,17; | [XA]US2018082822 (KELLOGG MICHAEL C [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0035] - [0049]; figures 1,2a * [A] 2-17 | by applicant | JP2008227063 |