EP4085820 - PROCESS FOR ANALYZING A TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eclypia Bâtiment de Haute Technologie 2 (BHT 2) 17 Rue Félix Esclangon 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2024/40] |
Former [2022/45] | For all designated states Eclypia 155 Cours Berriat 38000 GRENOBLE / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANC, Romain 38000 GRENOBLE / FR | 02 /
COUTARD, Jean-Guillaume 38660 SAINT PANCRASSE / FR | 03 /
GALLEGOS, Alexandre 75002 Paris / FR | 04 /
LE ROUX-MALLOUF, Thibault 38000 GRENOBLE / FR | 05 /
RUNGET, Freddy 38100 GRENOBLE / FR | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Fidal Innovation 4-6 avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 21172136.0 | 04.05.2021 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085820 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4085820 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/145 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
A61B5/0095 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/1451 (EP,KR);
A61B5/14546 (US);
A61B5/1455 (KR);
A61B5/4839 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/6802 (US);
A61B5/7246 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/7435 (US);
A61B5/746 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] |
Former [2022/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GEWEBEANALYSE | [2022/45] | English: | PROCESS FOR ANALYZING A TISSUE | [2022/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE D'UN TISSU | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 20.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 31.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 31.05.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009292202 (PRESURA CRISTIAN [NL], et al); | [XI]US2018323571 (BROWN ROBERT B [CA], et al); | [X]US2021052164 (SHNAIDERMAN RAMI [DE], et al); | [XI]US2021109019 (BAUER ALEXANDER [DE], et al) | Examination | WO2020094233 | by applicant | US10261011 | WO2020094265 |