EP4087075 - SUPERCONDUCTING POWER CABLE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NKT Cables Group A/S Vibeholms Allé 20 2605 Brøndby / DK | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLÉN, Dag Klagshamn / SE | 02 /
THIDEMANN, Carsten Jaegerspris / DK | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 21172174.1 | 04.05.2021 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087075 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/34, H01B12/16, // H01B12/06, H01B12/08 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H02G15/34 (EP,US);
H01B12/16 (EP,KR,US);
H01R4/68 (US);
H01B12/06 (EP);
H01B12/08 (EP);
Y02E40/60 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] |
Former [2022/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUPRALEITENDES STROMKABELSYSTEM | [2022/45] | English: | SUPERCONDUCTING POWER CABLE SYSTEM | [2022/45] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CÂBLE ÉLECTRIQUE SUPRACONDUCTEUR | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 08.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3463869 (COOLEY GERALD J, et al); | [A]US3697665 (DOOSE CONRAD, et al); | [X]US3946141 (SCHMIDT FRITZ); | [A]US2007107443 (ROYAL JOHN H [US], et al); | [A]US2020244130 (PALMER CHLOE J [GB]) |