EP3907070 - CONDUCTIVE ELASTOMERIC COMPOSITE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A CONDUCTIVE COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2021/45] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSS, Adam F. CHCAGO, 60606-2016 / US | 02 /
DUSTIN, ASHLEY CHCAGO, 60606-2016 / US | 03 /
NOWAK, Andrew P. CHCAGO, 60606-2016 / US | 04 /
GUAN, XIN CHCAGO, 60606-2016 / US | 05 /
SORENSEN, Adam E. CHCAGO, 60606-2016 / US | 06 /
SHARP, Richard E. CHCAGO, 60606-2016 / US | [2021/45] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21172186.5 | 05.05.2021 | [2021/45] | Priority number, date | US202016867765 | 06.05.2020 Original published format: US202016867765 | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3907070 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02, B32B25/10, B32B25/20, B32B27/08, B32B27/28, H01B1/22, B32B15/02, B32B15/04, B32B15/06, B32B15/08, C08J7/04 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
B32B5/024 (EP,IL);
H01B5/14 (CN);
B32B25/10 (EP,IL,US);
B32B15/02 (EP,IL);
B32B15/04 (EP,IL);
B32B15/06 (EP,IL);
B32B15/08 (EP,IL);
B32B25/20 (EP,IL,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,IL);
B32B27/283 (EP,IL);
B32B5/02 (IL,US);
B32B5/026 (EP,IL);
B64C1/068 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B64C3/20 (IL,US);
H01B1/22 (EP,IL);
H01B13/0026 (CN);
B32B2260/021 (EP,IL);
B32B2260/046 (EP,IL);
B32B2260/048 (EP,IL);
B32B2262/0276 (EP,IL);
B32B2262/103 (EP,IL);
B32B2274/00 (EP,IL);
B32B2307/202 (EP,IL,US);
B32B2307/51 (EP,IL);
B32B2605/18 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] |
Former [2021/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITENDER ELASTOMERER VERBUNDSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LEITENDEN VERBUNDSTOFFS | [2021/45] | English: | CONDUCTIVE ELASTOMERIC COMPOSITE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A CONDUCTIVE COMPOSITE | [2021/45] | French: | COMPOSITE ÉLASTOMÈRE CONDUCTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSITE CONDUCTEUR | [2021/45] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 26.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2016143251 (RICOH CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]US2019092994 (GWIN PAUL [US]); | [X]US2019217585 (TAKAMATSU YOSHINORI [JP], et al) |