EP3907350 - ASSEMBLY FOR SETTING THE POSITION OF BOARDS ON THE FACE OF A WALL AND SYSTEM FOR INSTALLING BOARDS ON THE FACE OF A WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Selena Industrial Technologies Sp. z o.o. Ul. Pieszycka 3 58-200 Dzierzoniów / PL | [2022/42] |
Former [2021/45] | For all designated states SELENA LABS Sp.z o.o. ul. Pieszycka 1 58-200 Dzierzoniow / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krzyzaniak, Michal 55-211 Wroclaw / PL | 02 /
Jarzab, Artur 55002 Kamieniec Wroclawski / PL | 03 /
Kula, Konrad 51180 Wroclaw / PL | 04 /
Zemanek, Piotr 58-360 Bielawa / PL | 05 /
Klimentowska, Katarzyna 52-200 Wysoka / PL | 06 /
Bandakova, Joanna 43-100 Tychy / PL | 07 /
Didyk-Mucha, Agnieszka 55-040 Krolikowice / PL | 08 /
Placzkiewicz, Krzysztof 58-200 Dzierzoniow / PL | [2023/35] |
Former [2021/45] | 01 /
Krzyzaniak, Michal 55-211 Wroclaw Iwaszkiewicza 5 / PL | ||
02 /
Jarzab, Artur 55002 Kamieniec Wroclawski, ul.Ogrodowa 5a / PL | |||
03 /
Kula, Konrad 51180 Wroclaw ul. Strazacka 55 / PL | |||
04 /
Zemanek, Piotr 58-360 Stefana Zeromskiego 39/82, BIelawa / PL | |||
05 /
Klimentowska, Katarzyna 52-200 Wysoka ul. Brzozowa 40/14 / PL | |||
06 /
Bandakova, Joanna 43-100 Tychy ul. Hutnicza 58/14 / PL | |||
07 /
Didyk-Mucha, Agnieszka 55-040 Krolikowice, ul. Dluga 8 / PL | |||
08 /
Placzkiewicz, Krzysztof 58-200 Dzierzoniow, ul.Chopina 9 / PL | Representative(s) | Pawlowska-Bajerska, Justyna Kancelaria Patentowa Justyna Pawlowska Wzgorze Bernardowo 263B/6 81-583 Gdynia / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | Pawlowska, Justyna Kancelaria Patentowa Justyna Pawlowska Wzgorze Bernardowo 263B/6 81-583 Gdynia / PL | Application number, filing date | 21172357.2 | 05.05.2021 | [2021/45] | Priority number, date | PL20200433894 | 06.05.2020 Original published format: PL 43389420 | [2021/45] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3907350 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3907350 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E04F21/00, E04F21/18, E04F21/22 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
E04F21/0092 (EP);
E04F21/1877 (EP);
E04F21/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] |
Former [2021/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TEILESATZ ZUM FESTLEGEN DER POSITION VON PLATTEN AUF DER OBERFLÄCHE EINER WAND UND SYSTEM ZUM INSTALLIEREN VON PLATTEN AUF DER OBERFLÄCHE EINER WAND | [2021/45] | English: | ASSEMBLY FOR SETTING THE POSITION OF BOARDS ON THE FACE OF A WALL AND SYSTEM FOR INSTALLING BOARDS ON THE FACE OF A WALL | [2021/45] | French: | JEU DE PIÈCES POUR FIXER LA POSITION DE PLAQUES SUR LA SURFACE D'UN MUR ET SYSTÈME POUR INSTALLER DES PLAQUES SUR LA SURFACE D'UN MUR | [2023/19] |
Former [2021/45] | JEU DE PIECES POUR FIXER LA POSITION DE PLAQUES SUR LA SURFACE D'UN MUR ET SYSTEME POUR INSTALLER DES PLAQUES SUR LA SURFACE D'UN MUR | Examination procedure | 01.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 05.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016222679 (BUNCH CLINTON D [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 1A, 1B, 2 *; | [A]US2020087925 (VANDENBERG ROGER A [US], et al) [A] 1* figures 17-23 * |