EP4087119 - METHOD FOR DETECTING AN ELECTRICAL FAULT IN THE STATOR OF AN ELECTRIC MACHINE, ESPECIALLY IN THE GENERATOR OF A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bhide, Ravindra Cherry Hinton, Cambridge CB1 9GF / GB | 02 /
Freire, Nuno Miguel Amaral 7330 Brande / DK | 03 /
R Pillai, Rahul 7430 Ikast / DK | 04 /
Szczesny, Ireneusz Grzegorz 7160 Tørring / DK | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/45] | SGRE-Association Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co KG Schlierseestraße 28 81539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21172507.2 | 06.05.2021 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087119 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02P29/024, H02P9/00, G01R31/34 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H02P29/024 (EP);
G01R31/52 (CN);
G01R31/346 (EP,US);
F03D17/00 (US);
F03D7/0224 (US);
F03D7/026 (US);
F03D9/25 (US);
G01R31/72 (CN);
H02P29/027 (EP);
H02P9/006 (EP);
H02P9/02 (US);
F05B2220/706 (US);
F05B2260/70 (US);
F05B2260/80 (US);
F05B2260/85 (US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] |
Former [2022/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION EINES ELEKTRISCHEN DEFEKTS IM STATOR EINER ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE, INSBESONDERE IM GENERATOR EINER WINDTURBINE | [2022/45] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING AN ELECTRICAL FAULT IN THE STATOR OF AN ELECTRIC MACHINE, ESPECIALLY IN THE GENERATOR OF A WIND TURBINE | [2022/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UNE DÉFAILLANCE ÉLECTRIQUE DANS LE STATOR D'UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE, EN PARTICULIER DANS LE GÉNÉRATEUR D'UNE ÉOLIENNE | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 09.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2014306583 (MØLLER TORBEN WERGE [DK]); | [XY]US2015276823 (RODRIGUEZ PEDRO [SE], et al); | [Y]CN105866614B | by applicant | US2011187304 |