EP4086091 - AUTOMOBILE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blue Technologies BV Logistiekweg 20 4387 PK Vlissingen / NL | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benner, Moritz 61279 Grävenwiesbach / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2022/45] | 01 /
Benner, Moritz 61273 Wehrheim / DE | Representative(s) | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte PartG mbB Irmgardstraße 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/45] | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstraße 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21172516.3 | 06.05.2021 | [2022/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4086091 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4086091 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60G3/14, B60G17/016, B62D61/10 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
B62D61/10 (EP);
B60G17/0164 (EP);
B60G3/145 (EP);
B60G2200/132 (EP);
B60G2200/422 (EP);
B60G2200/46 (EP);
B60G2200/462 (EP);
B60G2300/27 (EP);
B60G2400/10 (EP);
B60G2400/61 (EP);
B60G2500/324 (EP);
B60G2800/014 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] |
Former [2022/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUTOMOBIL SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES AUTOMOBILS | [2022/45] | English: | AUTOMOBILE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME | [2022/45] | French: | AUTOMOBILE, AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN AUTOMOBILE | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 23.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3523697 (O'SULLIVAN HENRY J) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,11 * the whole document * * page 1, lines 13-17 * * column 1, lines 52-55 * * column 2, lines 18-32; figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 6 * [Y] 5; | [XAY]US4007949 (NORCIA JOHN A, et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * * column 2, lines 9-42 * * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 56; figures 1-5 * [A] 11 [Y] 5; | [XY]US4079798 (FERRIS TOM) [X] 1,2,6-11 * the whole document * * column 1, lines 9-16 * * column 2, lines 5-11 * * column 4, lines 15-43; figures 2,3 * [Y] 7; | [YA]WO9719827 (NAVLET SALVATIERRA JUAN JOSE [ES]) [Y] 5 * the whole document * * page 19, lines 1-13; figures 1-14 * * page 26, line 30 - page 27, line 15; figure 10 * * page 37, lines 22-25 * * page 38, line 16 - page 39, line 11 * * page 39, lines 12-20 * [A] 3,6-10; | [A]US5938238 (LAMB ROGER [US]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document * * abstract *; | [XY]DE102010060274 (MAYER MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-11 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0008] , [0021] , [0022] , [0024] , [0041] , [0045] , [0095]; figure 17 * * paragraphs [0045] , [0047] , [0088] , [0089]; figures 8,9 * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraphs [0013] , [0036] * [Y] 5,7; | [A]US2013264805 (CALVERT JOHN [US]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document ** paragraph [0003] *; | [A]US2018154961 (WOODS CAMERON RAY [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6-8,11 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0037] , [0039]; figures 9-11 * * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0038]; figure 12 * | Examination | DE3409447 |