EP3910522 - METHODS AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIA FOR SYNTHESIS OF A NETWORK-ON-CHIP FOR DEADLOCK-FREE TRANSFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arteris, Inc. 595 Millich Dr., Suite 200 Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHERIF, Moez Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 02 /
DE LESCURE, Benoit Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2021/46] | Representative(s) | Sach, Greg Robert Valet Patent Services Limited c/o Caya 83713X Am Börstig 5 96052 Bamberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | Sach, Greg Robert Sach & Associates Siedlungsstrasse 4a 85253 Erdweg / DE | Application number, filing date | 21173034.6 | 10.05.2021 | [2021/46] | Priority number, date | US202016872096 | 11.05.2020 Original published format: US202016872096 | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3910522 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F30/373, G06F15/78, G06F30/394, G06F30/398, G06F30/18, // G06F111/04 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
G06F30/327 (EP,CN);
H04L49/109 (EP,KR);
H04L41/145 (CN,US);
G06F15/17 (CN);
G06F15/7807 (CN);
G06F15/7825 (EP);
G06F30/32 (EP,US);
G06F30/39 (EP);
G06F30/392 (EP,US);
G06F30/394 (EP,CN,US);
H04L41/0803 (US);
H04L41/0823 (CN);
H04L41/0893 (KR);
H04L41/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/0811 (EP,US);
H04L43/0876 (EP);
H04L45/46 (US);
H04L67/1001 (US);
H04L69/329 (US);
H04W40/32 (US);
H04W84/18 (US);
G06F2115/02 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] |
Former [2021/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERLESBARE MEDIEN ZUR SYNTHESE EINES NETZWERKS AUF EINEM CHIP FÜR BLOCKIERUNGSFREIE TRANSFORMATION | [2021/46] | English: | METHODS AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIA FOR SYNTHESIS OF A NETWORK-ON-CHIP FOR DEADLOCK-FREE TRANSFORMATION | [2021/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SUPPORTS LISIBLES PAR ORDINATEUR DE SYNTHÈSE D'UN RÉSEAU SUR PUCE POUR UNE TRANSFORMATION SANS INTERBLOCAGE | [2021/46] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 17.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6437804 (IBE OLIVER [US], et al); |