EP3920465 - PRIVATE DATA SHARING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, HR, LV, NL, NO, RS, SE | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moffat, Brian Lee 3440 Corpus Christi Street Simi Valley, CA 93063 / US | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla de Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 21173129.4 | 11.10.2011 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | US201040479410P | 08.10.2010 Original published format: US 40479410 P | WO2011US55417 | 07.10.2011 Original published format: PCT/US2011/055417 | US201113270118 | 10.10.2011 Original published format: US201113270118 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3920465 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3920465 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04L9/08, G06Q50/00, H04L9/40, H04L51/52 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
H04L9/0822 (EP,US);
H04L51/52 (EP,US);
G06F21/6245 (US);
H04L51/066 (US);
H04L51/212 (US);
H04L63/0421 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (US);
H04L63/0435 (US);
H04L63/06 (EP,US);
H04L63/065 (US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L67/303 (US);
H04L67/306 (US);
H04L9/0825 (EP,US);
H04L9/0891 (EP,US);
H04L9/0894 (EP,US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US);
H04L2209/16 (US);
H04L2209/60 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | H04L9/32, H04L29/06, H04L9/08, H04L12/58, G06Q50/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] |
Former [2021/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM TEILEN PRIVATER DATEN | [2021/49] | English: | PRIVATE DATA SHARING SYSTEM | [2021/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PARTAGE DE DONNÉES PRIVÉES | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 03.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11831765.0 / EP2625820 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003163697 (PABLA KULDIP SINGH [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0063] * * figures 3, 6 *; | [A]US6868160 (RAJI ALEXANDER DAVID [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 27 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2009150968 (OZZIE RAYMOND E [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract ** paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0051] *; | [X] - ASHLEY M ET AL, "The GNU Privacy Handbook", INTERNET CITATION, (19990101), URL: http://www.gnupg.org/(en)/documentation/index.html, (20040629), XP002286316 [X] 1 * Chapter 1 * |