EP3932463 - APPLICATOR FOR APPLYING A MICRONEEDLE DEVICE TO SKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kindeva Drug Delivery L.P. 42 Water Street, Building 75 St. Paul, MN 55170 / US | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURTON, Scott A. Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MOECKLY, Craig S. Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
SIMMERS, Ryan Patrick Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2022/01] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 21173161.7 | 07.01.2014 | [2022/01] | Priority number, date | US201361750128P | 08.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361750128 P | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3932463 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
A61M37/0015 (EP,US);
A61M5/5086 (US);
A61M2037/0023 (EP,US);
A61M2037/0046 (EP,US);
A61M2205/106 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] |
Former [2022/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINER MIKRONADELVORRICHTUNG AUF DIE HAUT | [2022/01] | English: | APPLICATOR FOR APPLYING A MICRONEEDLE DEVICE TO SKIN | [2022/01] | French: | APPLICATEUR POUR APPLIQUER UN DISPOSITIF DE MICRO-AIGUILLE SUR LA PEAU | [2022/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 04.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14737512.5 / EP2943238 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008208146 (BRANDWEIN DAVID H [US], et al) [A] 1-11* page 1, paragraph 7 - page 7, paragraph 82; figures 1-12D *; | [XI]WO2010098339 (SYSMEX CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,10 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 29, paragraph 99; figures 1-33 * [I] 6; | [X]EP2236083 (SYSMEX CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-11 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 13, paragraph 87; figures 1-27 *; | [X]WO2011115602 (NANOMED DEVICES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 1, line 1 - page 49, line 2; figures 1-13 * | by applicant | US6091975 | US6312612 | US6379324 | US6558361 | US2004049150 | US2005261631 | US7648484 | US2010256568 | US2011213335 | US2012123387 | WO2012074576 | WO2012122162 |