EP3895846 - DRYWALL SCREW DRIVING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ullrich, Andre 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 02 /
Froehling, Holger 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 21173192.2 | 04.06.2012 | [2021/42] | Priority number, date | DE20111078384 | 30.06.2011 Original published format: DE102011078384 | [2021/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895846 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B25B21/00, B25B23/00, B25B23/14 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
B25B23/0064 (EP,CN,US);
B25B21/00 (EP,CN,US);
B25B21/002 (US);
B25B23/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] |
Former [2021/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TROCKENBAUSCHRAUBER | [2021/42] | English: | DRYWALL SCREW DRIVING DEVICE | [2021/42] | French: | TOURNEVIS DE CONSTRUCTION À SEC | [2021/42] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 20.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12725751.7 / EP2726250 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0349807 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 3* abstract *; | [X]EP1033204 (MAKITA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1941973 (PROTOOL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO2009044932 (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * abstract * [A] 3-9 |