EP3910495 - REDUCING DESCRIPTION LENGTH BASED ON CONFIDENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINESIO, Andrew, James Saratoga, CA / US | 02 /
KLINE Ill, Frank-Robert Ketchum, ID / US | 03 /
KUFELDT, Sara E. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 04 /
PARISA, Kranti, K. San Jose, CA / US | 05 /
MACRAE, Robert Mountain View, CA / US | 06 /
COFFMAN, Patrick L. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 07 /
GOYAL, Ankur Cupertino, 95014 / US | [2023/16] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
SINESIO, Andrew, James Saratoga, CA / US | ||
02 /
KLINE Ill, Frank-Robert Ketchum, ID / US | |||
03 /
KUFELDT, Sara E. Cupertino, 95014 / US | |||
04 /
PARISA, Kranti, K. San Jose, CA / US | |||
05 /
MACRAE, Robert Mountain View, CA / US | |||
06 /
COFFMAN, Patrick L. Cupertino, 95014 / US | Representative(s) | COPA Copenhagen Patents Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor 1970 Frederiksberg C / DK | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 21173289.6 | 11.05.2021 | [2021/46] | Priority number, date | US202063023692P | 12.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063023692 P | US202016990551 | 11.08.2020 Original published format: US202016990551 | DK2020PA70545 | 24.08.2020 Original published format: DK PA202070545 | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3910495 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/48, G06F16/68 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
G06F16/48 (EP);
G06F3/167 (CN);
G06F16/3329 (CN);
G06F16/3343 (CN);
G06F16/68 (EP);
G06F16/90332 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2021/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRINGERUNG DER BESCHREIBUNGSLÄNGE BASIEREND AUF VERTRAUEN | [2021/46] | English: | REDUCING DESCRIPTION LENGTH BASED ON CONFIDENCE | [2021/46] | French: | RÉDUCTION DE LA LONGUEUR DE DESCRIPTION BASÉ SUR LA CONFIANCE | [2021/46] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 28.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2007022533 (GRACENOTE INC [US], et al); | [A]US2016378747 (ORR RYAN M [US], et al); | [XA]US2019147052 (LU GUANG [CN], et al); | [A]US10515133 (SHARIFI MATTHEW [US]) | by applicant | US6323846 | US2002015024 | US6570557 | US6677932 | US2005190059 | US2006017692 | US7657849 | US19620609365 | US20040840862 | US20040903964 | US20050038590 | US20050048264 | US20050228758 | US20050228700 | US20050228737 | US20050322549 | US20060367749 | US20060381313 | US20070968067 | US20080240788 | US20080241839 | US20080341743 | US20090586862 | US20090620702 | US20090638251 | US20110987982 | WO2013US40061 | WO2013US69483 |