EP3971546 - LOAD CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delta Electronics, Inc. No. 252, Shanying Road Guishan District Taoyuan City 333 / TW | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG Yu-Xian Taoyuan City 333, Taiwan, R.O.C. / TW | 02 /
LIANG, Yi-Min Taoyuan City 333, Taiwan, R.O.C. / TW | 03 /
LU, Chieh-Huang Taoyuan City 333, Taiwan, R.O.C. / TW | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 21173551.9 | 12.05.2021 | [2022/12] | Priority number, date | US202063079568P | 17.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063079568 P | US202117241931 | 27.04.2021 Original published format: US202117241931 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3971546 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/22, G01L5/1627 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
G01L1/2231 (EP,US);
G01G23/005 (US);
G01L5/1627 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] |
Former [2022/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAFTMESSZELLE | [2022/12] | English: | LOAD CELL | [2022/12] | French: | CELLULE DE CHARGE | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 08.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3365689 (UMIT KUTSAY ALI); | [XI]US6005199 (HARADA SHUNJI [JP], et al); | [XI]US8726741 (KRIPPNER PETER [DE], et al); | [XI]WO2020158166 (NIDEC COPAL ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) |