EP3929851 - METHOD FOR REGISTERING A TICKET MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scheidt & Bachmann GmbH Breite Strasse 132 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krivosik, Martin 91927 Brestovany / SK | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 21173902.4 | 14.05.2021 | [2021/52] | Priority number, date | DE202010116943 | 26.06.2020 Original published format: DE102020116943 | [2021/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929851 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G06Q50/30 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
G06Q30/018 (EP);
G06Q20/0457 (US);
G06Q20/145 (US);
G06Q20/401 (US);
G06Q50/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] |
Former [2021/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM REGISTRIEREN EINES TICKETMEDIUMS | [2021/52] | English: | METHOD FOR REGISTERING A TICKET MEDIUM | [2021/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT D'UN SUPPORT BILLET | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 09.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP3252697 (SCHEIDT & BACHMANN GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0060] *; | [I]EP3621042 (SCHEIDT & BACHMANN GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-11 * abstract ** paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0129] * | by applicant | US8991699 |