EP3884977 - TESTING METHOD FOR A DRY POWDER INHALER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norton (Waterford) Limited Unit 301 IDA Industrial Park Cork Road Swiss Cottage, Waterford / IE | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'SULLIVAN, Denis Henry Kilkeny / IE | 02 /
BUCK, Daniel R Waterford / IE | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Patent Boutique LLP 10A Printing House Yard Hackney Road London E2 7PR / GB | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 21174417.2 | 16.01.2018 | [2021/39] | Priority number, date | GB20170000727 | 16.01.2017 Original published format: GB 201700727 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3884977 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3884977 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, G01N15/02 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
A61M15/00 (EP,IL);
A61M15/0065 (IL,KR);
A61M15/0008 (IL,US);
A61K31/137 (IL,KR);
A61K31/56 (IL,KR);
A61K31/58 (IL,KR);
A61K9/0075 (IL,KR);
A61M15/0001 (IL,US);
A61M15/002 (IL,KR);
A61M15/0021 (IL,KR);
A61M15/0086 (IL,US);
A61M15/0091 (IL,US);
A61M16/14 (IL,US);
A61P11/00 (IL,KR);
A61P11/06 (IL,KR);
G01N15/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01N15/075 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01N2015/0046 (EP,IL,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2021/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PRÜFVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN TROCKENPULVERINHALATOR | [2021/39] | English: | TESTING METHOD FOR A DRY POWDER INHALER | [2021/39] | French: | MÉTHODE DE TEST POUR INHALATEUR DE POUDRE SÈCHE | [2021/39] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 29.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 05.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2024 | Observations by third parties | 07.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18700589.7 / EP3568180 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 05.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.05.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009029027 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [XI]WO2011054527 (NORTON HEALTHCARE LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO2012078804 (RESPIRA THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) | Examination | WO0200281 | by applicant | WO2011054527 | other | EP3568180 |