EP4091920 - AUTOMOBILE WITH A MOVABLE WIND GUIDE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blue Technologies BV Logistiekweg 20 4387 PK Vlissingen / NL | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNER, Moritz 61279 Grävenwiesbach / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2022/47] | 01 /
BENNER, Moritz 61273 Wehrheim / DE | Representative(s) | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte PartG mbB Irmgardstraße 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstraße 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21174418.0 | 18.05.2021 | [2022/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091920 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62D35/00, B62D35/02 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
B62D35/007 (EP);
B62D35/02 (EP);
B62D37/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] |
Former [2022/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMOBIL MIT EINEM BEWEGLICHEN WINDLEITELEMENT | [2022/47] | English: | AUTOMOBILE WITH A MOVABLE WIND GUIDE ELEMENT | [2022/47] | French: | AUTOMOBILE AYANT UN ÉLÉMENT MOBILE DE GUIDAGE DU VENT | [2022/47] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 23.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0391864 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3,5,12 * column 2, line 8 - line 26; figures 1-4 * [A] 4,6-11; | [XA]DE602004004691T (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-11; | [XA]EP3357800 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,10-12 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-3D *[A] 2-9 |