EP3889048 - METHOD FOR OPTIMISING THE NOISE GENERATED IN FLIGHT BY A ROTORCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Helicopters Aéroport International Marseille Provence 13725 Marignane Cedex / FR | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOMEZ, Nayibe 13090 AIX EN PROVENCE / FR | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | GPI Brevets 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière EuroParc de Pichaury Bât B2 13856 Aix en Provence Cedex 3 / FR | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 21174596.3 | 23.03.2020 | [2021/40] | Priority number, date | FR20190003327 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: FR 1903327 | [2021/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3889048 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3889048 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B64D35/08, B64D27/02, B64D27/24 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
B64D35/08 (EP);
B64D31/06 (EP,KR,US);
B64D27/02 (CN,US);
F02D35/0007 (US);
B64C27/04 (KR);
B64D27/026 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B64D27/10 (US);
B64D27/24 (EP,CN,US);
B64D31/00 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] |
Former [2021/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DES LÄRMS, DER VON EINEM DREHFLÜGELFLUGZEUG IM FLUG ERZEUGT WIRD | [2021/40] | English: | METHOD FOR OPTIMISING THE NOISE GENERATED IN FLIGHT BY A ROTORCRAFT | [2021/40] | French: | PROCEDE D'OPTIMISATION DU BRUIT GENERE EN VOL PAR UN GIRAVION | [2021/40] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 19.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20165034.8 / EP3715260 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2014010652 (SUNTHARALINGAM PIRANAVAN [CA], et al); | [YA]US8852052 (SUJAN VIVEK ANAND [US], et al); | [YA]US2016362100 (PIPER ERIC [US], et al); | [YA]US2018009542 (KUSTER MARTIN [CH]); | [A]WO2018175349 (ZUNUM AERO INC [US]) | by applicant | EP2571764 | US2014010652 | US8852052 | US2016362100 | FR3039614 | US2018009542 |