EP3954782 - FUNCTIONALIZED GEL BEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 10X Genomics, Inc. 6230 Stoneridge Mall Road Pleasanton, CA 94588-3260 / US | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENT, Zachary Pleasanton, CA 94588-3260 / US | 02 /
MEER, Elliott Pleasanton, CA 94588-3260 / US | 03 /
RIORDAN, Daniel Pleasanton, CA 94588-3260 / US | 04 /
RYVKIN, Paul Pleasanton, CA 94588-3260 / US | 05 /
SRINIVAS, Niranjan Pleasanton, CA 94588-3260 / US | 06 /
TERRY, Jessica Pleasanton, CA 94588-3260 / US | 07 /
GAGNON, Alex Pleasanton, CA 94588-3260 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21174805.8 | 15.11.2018 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | US201762586784P | 15.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762586784 P | US201862629561P | 12.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862629561 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954782 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6806 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6811 (US);
C12Q1/6834 (US);
C40B20/04 (EP,US);
C40B50/16 (US);
C40B50/18 (US);
G06K19/06093 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2521/319, C12Q2521/501, C12Q2525/155, C12Q2525/191, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2563/149, C12Q2563/159, C12Q2563/179, C12Q2565/537, C12Q2565/629 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FUNKTIONALISIERTE GELPERLEN | [2022/07] | English: | FUNCTIONALIZED GEL BEADS | [2022/07] | French: | PERLES DE GEL FONCTIONNALISÉES | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 12.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18812579.3 / EP3625361 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012048341 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * see whole doc. esp. example and claims 15 and 17, *; | [A]WO2013126741 (RAINDANCE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * see whole doc. esp. claims and Figures 2 and 3 *; | [Y]US2015298091 (WEITZ DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * see whole doc. esp. claims and Figure 7, pars 178,204 *; | [A]WO2015200893 (10X GENOMICS INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * see whole doc. esp. claims and e.g. Figures 10-12 and par. 92 *; | [A]WO2016168584 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [A] 1-16 * see whole doc. esp. Figs. 2 and 3, page 39 ff. *; | [Y]US2017073747 (JOUNG J KEITH [US], et al) [Y] 1-16* see whole doc. esp. claim 1, Figure 1 and e.g. par. 77 * | by applicant | US2010105112 | US2014155295 | US2014378345 | US2015292988 | US2015376609 | - DIXIT et al., "Perturb-Seq: Dissecting Molecular Circuits with Scalable Single-Cell RNA Profiling of Pooled Genetic Screens", Cell, (20161215), vol. 167, no. 7, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2016.11.038, pages 1853 - 1866, XP029850713 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2016.11.038 |