EP4092760 - PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Solar Energy Research Center Konstanz E.V. Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 15 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALM, Andreas 78462 Konstanz / DE | 02 /
FARNEDA, Rüdiger 78315 Radolfzell / DE | 03 /
TUNE, Daniel 78464 Konstanz / DE | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21174899.1 | 20.05.2021 | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4092760 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/05, H01L31/068, H01L31/0224 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
H01L31/022441 (EP);
H01L31/0508 (EP);
H01L31/0516 (EP);
H01L31/0682 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] |
Former [2022/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOTOVOLTAIKMODUL | [2022/47] | English: | PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULE | [2022/47] | French: | MODULE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE | [2022/47] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 04.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20180072110 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XI]CN110246911 (TAIZHOU LONGI SOLAR TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6,10-13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] - [0004] - [0005] - [0012] - [0022] - [0059] * [I] 14,16; | [A]EP3598506 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [XI]WO2020054129 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10,13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - [0009] , [0010] - [0012] - [0016] - [0019] - [0032] - [0052] * [I] 14,16; | [XI]WO2021020465 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-10,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0011] , [0013] - [0015] - [0022] - [0029] - [0032] , [0036] , [0039] , [0048] - [0051] * [I] 14,16 | by applicant | US2018108796 | - G. GALBIATI et al., "Large area back-contact back-junction solar cells with efficiency exceeding 21%", 2012 IEEE 38th Photovoltaic Specialists Conference (PVSC), (20120000), doi:10.1109/PVSC-Vol 2.2013.6656700, pages 1 - 4, XP032521110 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PVSC-Vol 2.2013.6656700 | - R. KOPECEK et al., "ZEBRA technology: low cost bifacial IBC solar cells in mass production with efficiency exceeding 23.5%", 2020 47th IEEE Photovoltaic Specialists Conference (PVSC, (20200000), doi:10.1109/PVSC45281.2020.9300503, pages 1008 - 1012, XP033870602 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PVSC45281.2020.9300503 |