EP3912860 - IMPROVEMENTS TO AUTOMATIC TWISTLOCK ARRANGEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skrin Pty Ltd Suite 7, 200 Toorak Road South Yarra, Victoria 3141 / AU | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NYHOLM, Ture South Yarra, Victoria, 3141 / AU | [2021/47] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 21175075.7 | 20.05.2021 | [2021/47] | Priority number, date | AU20200901621 | 20.05.2020 Original published format: AU 2020901621 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3912860 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3912860 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/13 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
B60P7/132 (EP,AU,CN);
B61D45/007 (AU,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] |
Former [2021/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN AUTOMATISCHEN DREHRIEGELANORDNUNGEN | [2021/47] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS TO AUTOMATIC TWISTLOCK ARRANGEMENTS | [2021/47] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS PORTANT SUR DES AGENCEMENTS DE VERROU TOURNANT AUTOMATIQUE | [2021/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 19.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.01.2024 | BG | 31.01.2024 | ES | 31.01.2024 | FI | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | LT | 31.01.2024 | LV | 31.01.2024 | NL | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | SE | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | PT | 31.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
LV | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
PL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
PT | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 31.01.2024 | |
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2303401 (MULTI STROKE LIMITED [GB]) [Y] 1,13,14 * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 2 * * figures 13-15 *; | [A]US9238430 (METTERNICH HEINZ-RUEDIGER [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4 - column 6 ** figures 1-5 *; | [XAYI]US2019359113 (GU XIAOPING [CN], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0046] * * figure 4 * [A] 5,6,9-12 [Y] 1,13,14 [I] 3,4,7,8; | [X]CN110696709 (CIMC VEHICLES GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1,15 * the whole document * |