EP4091444 - COLLECTOR FOR PLANT PESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tempel, Matthias 50935 Köln / DE | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21175311.6 | 21.05.2021 | [2022/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091444 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01M1/20 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
A01M1/2011 (EP,IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] |
Former [2022/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FANGSCHALE FÜR PFLANZENSCHÄDLINGE | [2022/47] | English: | COLLECTOR FOR PLANT PESTS | [2022/47] | French: | BAC DE RÉCUPÉRATION POUR ORGANISMES NUISIBLES AUX VÉGÉTAUX | [2022/47] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 23.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/44] | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2250227 (BTC BIOTECH INT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] *; | [A]DE10148833 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0074] *; | [A]JP3765645B (EARTH CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0036] *; | [XA]CN104382481 (CHANGSHU KASMAIN CO LTD) [X] 1,4-6,9,10 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] *[A] 2,3,7,8,11-15; | [XA]CN211269918U (JIN WENJIE) [X] 1,4-6 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * [A] 2,3,7-15 | by applicant | WO0217119 | KR20100127473 | WO2018054767 | WO2020058170 | WO2020058175 | - O. LOPEZ et al., "Monitoring Pest Insect Traps by Means of Low-Power Image Sensor Technologies", Sensors, (20120000), vol. 12, no. 12, doi:10.3390/s121115801, pages 15801 - 15819, XP055352347 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s121115801 |