EP3944008 - SMART GARMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kyong Il Seoul 06518 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Hyung Rae Seoul 05593 / KR | 03 /
SOHN, Dong Hyun Hwaseong-si 18477 / KR | 04 /
HWANG, In Oh Seongnam-si 13600 / KR | [2024/29] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
KIM, Kyong Il 06518 Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
CHO, Hyung Rae 05593 Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
SOHN, Dong Hyun 18447 Hwaseong-si / KR | |||
04 /
HWANG, In Oh 13600 Seongnam-si / KR | Representative(s) | Rose, Kathryn Clare, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 21175526.9 | 01.04.2016 | [2022/04] | Priority number, date | KR20150139231 | 02.10.2015 Original published format: KR 20150139231 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944008 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13, G02F1/1333, G06Q50/04, G06Q30/06, H04N5/44, A41D27/08, G09G3/3208, G02F1/1334, // A41D15/00, A41D31/00, D01D5/30, D01F8/00, D03D1/00, D03D15/54, D03D15/547, G09G5/00 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
D03D15/54 (EP,CN,US);
A41D1/002 (CN,US);
A41D15/00 (EP,CN,US);
A41D27/08 (EP,CN,US);
A41D31/0005 (EP,CN,US);
D01D5/30 (EP,CN);
D01F8/00 (EP,CN);
D03D1/0088 (EP,CN,US);
D03D15/547 (EP,CN,US);
D03D15/60 (US);
D03D15/67 (US);
G02F1/1313 (EP,CN);
G02F1/1333 (EP,CN);
G02F1/1334 (EP,CN);
G02F1/134309 (CN);
G02F1/155 (CN);
G02F1/167 (CN);
G02F1/16757 (CN);
G02F1/1676 (CN);
G06F3/0482 (CN);
G06F3/04842 (CN,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q50/04 (EP,CN,US);
G09G5/003 (EP,CN,US);
G09G5/006 (CN,US);
H04L67/12 (CN,US);
H04N21/42204 (US);
H04N5/44 (EP,CN,US);
D10B2401/18 (EP,CN,US);
D10B2401/20 (EP,CN);
G02F2001/1555 (CN);
G02F2202/022 (EP,CN);
G09G2320/041 (EP,CN,US);
G09G2360/144 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2022/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES KLEIDUNGSSTÜCK | [2022/04] | English: | SMART GARMENT | [2022/04] | French: | VÊTEMENT INTELLIGENT | [2022/04] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 29.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16851959.3 / EP3340160 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2003280049 (TDK CORP); | [XI]US2009174325 (VAN BRUGGEN MICHEL PAUL BARBARA [NL], et al); | [XI]US2011068493 (BUYUKTANIR EBRU A [US], et al); | [X]US2011317240 (SOTZING GREGORY A [US], et al) |