EP3920235 - DISPLAY PANEL AND DISPLAY APPARATUS INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Kyunghyun Yongin-si, 17113 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Seongjun Yongin-si, 17113 / KR | 03 /
EBISUNO, Kohei Yongin-si, 17113 / KR | 04 /
JEONG, Heeseong Yongin-si, 17113 / KR | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 21175548.3 | 24.05.2021 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | KR20200066676 | 02.06.2020 Original published format: KR 20200066676 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3920235 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H10K50/844, H10K59/35, H01L27/12 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
H10K59/353 (EP);
H01L27/1218 (KR);
H10K59/122 (CN);
H10K50/844 (US);
H01L27/1248 (KR);
H10K59/121 (US);
H10K59/1213 (CN);
H10K59/123 (CN);
H10K59/124 (CN);
H10K59/126 (EP,CN);
H10K59/873 (EP,CN,KR);
H01L27/14678 (US);
H10K2102/00 (US);
H10K2102/351 (US);
H10K50/818 (US);
H10K50/856 (US);
H10K50/868 (US);
H10K59/1216 (US);
H10K59/35 (US);
H10K59/352 (EP);
H10K59/40 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | H01L27/32, H01L51/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] |
Former [2021/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEBILDSCHIRM UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2021/49] | English: | DISPLAY PANEL AND DISPLAY APPARATUS INCLUDING THE SAME | [2021/49] | French: | PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE LE COMPRENANT | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 30.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013140547 (LEE JAE-SEOB [KR], et al); | [A]EP3486962 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [A]EP3588571 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR20200066676 |