EP4095377 - WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lund, Mogens 6920 Videbaek / DK | 02 /
Sørensen, Ruben Bak 7080 Børkop / DK | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/48] | SGRE-Association Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co KG Schlierseestraße 28 81539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21175942.8 | 26.05.2021 | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4095377 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F03D80/80 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
F03D80/82 (EP);
F03D80/821 (US);
F03D80/85 (EP);
H02J3/381 (US);
H02J3/46 (US);
H02J2300/28 (US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDTURBINE | [2022/48] | English: | WIND TURBINE | [2022/48] | French: | ÉOLIENNE | [2022/48] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/47] | 06.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016165720 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]); | [A]CN106787803 (BEIJING GOLDWIND SCIENCE & CREATION WINDPOWER EQUIPMENT CO LTD); | [A]EP3245528 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]); | [A]CN210927123U (XINJIANG GOLDWIND SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) |