EP3939583 - IMPROVEMENTS IN CANCER TREATMENT WITH ISOFLAVONOIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Noxopharm Limited PO Box 824 Turramurra, New South Wales 2074 / AU | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLY, Graham Turramurra, 2074 / AU | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 21176052.5 | 28.07.2016 | [2022/03] | Priority number, date | US201662318946P | 06.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662318946 P | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3939583 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/353, A61K47/44, A61K9/00, A61K9/02, A61P35/00 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
A61K9/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0031 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/353 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/12 (KR,US);
A61K47/44 (EP,US);
A61K9/0034 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN IN DER KREBSBEHANDLUNG MIT ISOFLAVONOIDEN | [2022/03] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN CANCER TREATMENT WITH ISOFLAVONOIDS | [2022/03] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER AVEC DES ISOFLAVONOÏDES | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/52] | 09.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16897482.2 / EP3439651 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20110004525 ; | [XDI]WO9808503 (NOVOGEN RES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [XD] 1-4,7-9,11,12 * pages 2-4; compounds 1-10 * * page 6, lines 6-20 * * page 9, lines 11-16 * * page 11, lines 15-17 * * claims 2, 4 * [I] 5,6,10; | [X]WO2004009035 (CHILDRENS HOSP MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,11,12 * page 11, paragraph [0061] ** page 26, paragraph [0145] *; | [XI]WO2004030662 (NOVOGEN RES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,11,12 * page 19, line 16 - page 21, line l * * page 27, lines 1-3 * * page 30, lines 1-5 * * page 31, lines 23-28 * * page 36, lines 18-23 * * example 2 * * claims 1, 6-9, 12-13 * [I] 5,6,10; | [XI]US2007036834 (PAULETTI GIOVANNI M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,11,12 * page 19; example 3 * [I] 4-6,8,10; | [A] - LIPP M ET AL, "Review of cocoa butter and alternative fats for use in chocolate-Part A. Compositional data", FOOD CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER LTD, NL, (19980101), vol. 62, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0308-8146(97)00160-X, ISSN 0308-8146, pages 73 - 97, XP002212469 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 76; table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0308-8146(97)00160-X | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 04, Database accession no. 2011-B25102, XP002794198 & KR20110004525 A 20110114 (UNIV DONG EUI IND ACADEMIC COOP FOUND) [X] 1-3,7-9,11,12 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9808503 | WO2005049008 | - ALVERO ABROSSI PBROWN DLEISER AKELLY MRUTHERFORD THUSBAND AJMOR G, "Phenoxodiol - a chemosensitizer in the midst of cancer chemoresistance", US Oncology, (20080000), vol. 24, pages 39 - 41 | - LIU HQ LCHENG X et al., "UDP-glucuronosyltransferase 1 A determinates intracellular accumulation and anti-cancer effect of (3-lapachone in human colon cancer cells", PLoS One, (20150000), vol. 10, page 11705 | - PANT SBURNS HABENDELL JCKURKJIAN CJONES SFMORENO OKUHN JGMCMEEKIN SINFANTE JR., "A first-in-human dose-escalation study of ME-143, a second generation NADH oxidase inhibitor, in patients with advanced solid cancers", Invest New Drugs, (20140000), vol. 32, doi:10.1007/s10637-013-9949-4, pages 87 - 93, XP035906180 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10637-013-9949-4 | - PIAO MMORI DSATOH T et al., "Inhibition of endothelial cell proliferation, in vitro angiogenesis, and the down-regulation of cell adhesion-related genes by genistein. Combined with a cDNA microarray analysis", Endothelium, (20060000), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 249 - 66 | - ADJAKLY MNGOLLO MDAGDEMIR AJUDES GPAJON AKARSLI-CEPPIOGLU SPENAULT-LLORCA FBOITEUX JPBIGNON YJGUY L, "Prostate cancer: the main risk and protective factors - epigenetic modifications", Ann Endoncrinol (Paris, (20150000), vol. 76, pages 25 - 41 | - KAZI ADANIEL KGSMITH DM et al., "Inhibition of the proteasome activity, a novel mechanism associated with the tumor cell apoptosis-inducing ability of genistein.", Biochem Pharmacol, (20030000), vol. 66, no. 6, pages 965 - 76 | - GUY LVEDRINE NURPI-SARDA MGIL-IZGUIERDO AAI-MAHARIK NBOITEAUX JPSCALBERT AREMESY CBOTTING NPMANACH C., "Orally administered isoflavones are present as glucosides in the human prostate", J Nutr, (20080000), vol. 60, pages 461 - 8 | - ZHANG YHENDRICH SMURPHY PA., "Glucuronides are the main isoflavone metabolites in women", J Nutr, (20030000), vol. 133, pages 399 - 404 | - KING CDRIOS GRGREEN MDTEPHLY TR, "UDP-glucuronosyltransferases", Curr Drug Metab, (20000000), vol. 1, doi:10.2174/1389200003339171, pages 143 - 161, XP001121074 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1389200003339171 | - GUILLEMETTE C., "Pharmacogenomics of human UDP-glucuronosyltransferase enzymes", Pharmacogenomics J, (20030000), vol. 3, pages 136 - 158 | - MARUO YIWAI MMORI ASATO HTAKEUCHI Y., "Polymorphism of UDP-glucuronosyltransferase and drug metabolism", Curr Drug Metab, (20050000), vol. 6, pages 91 - 99 | - WU BKULKARNI KBASU SZHANG SHU M., "First-pass metabolism via UDP-glucuronosyltransferase: a barrier to oral bioavailability of phenolics", J Pharmaceutical Sci, (20110000), vol. 100, pages 3655 - 3681 | - HOWES JBDE SOUZA PLWEST LHUANG LJHOWES LG, "Pharmacokinetics of phenoxodiol, a novel isoflavone, following intravenous administration to patients with advanced cancer", BMC Clin Pharmacol., (20110203), vol. 11, doi:10.1186/1472-6904-11-1, page 1, XP021087936 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6904-11-1 | - MACHIN GAHALPER JPKNOWLES DM., "Cytochemically demonstrable b-glucuronidase activity in normal and neoplastic lymphoid cells", Blood, (19800000), vol. 56, pages 1111 - 9 | - PETERS WHMKOCK LNAGENGAST FMKREMERS PG., "Biotransformation enzymes in human intestine. Critical low levels in the colon?", Gut, (19910000), vol. 32, pages 408 - 412 | - BASU NKCIOTTI MHWANG MSKOLE LMITRA PSCHO JWOWENS IS, "Differential and special properties of the major human UGT1-encoded gastrointestinal UDP-glucuronosyltransferases enhance potential to control chemical uptake", J Biol Chem, (20040000), vol. 279, pages 1429 - 1441 | - FOTOPOULOU CVERGOTE IMAINWARING PBIDZINSKI MVERMORKEN JBGHAMANDE SAHARNETT PDEL PRETE SAGREEN JASPACZYNSKI M, "Weekly AUC2 carboplatin in acquired platinum-resistant ovarian cancer with or without oral phenoxodiol, a sensitizer of platinum cytotoxicity: the Phase III OVATURE multicentre randomized study", Ann Oncol, (20140000), vol. 25, pages 160 - 165 | - BROWN DHEATON AHUSBAND A, "Idronoxil", Drugs Fut, (20080000), vol. 33, no. 10, pages 844 - 860 |