EP3934209 - TCP NETWORK PACKET PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Rujie Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHENG, Kai Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Maoqing Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | [2022/01] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 21176705.8 | 29.03.2017 | [2022/01] | Priority number, date | CN201610619837 | 30.07.2016 Original published format: CN201610619837 | [2022/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3934209 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3934209 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L69/16, H04L67/141, H04L67/142, H04L67/143, H04L67/146, // H04L67/12 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H04L69/163 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/14 (CN,US);
H04L43/0811 (US);
H04L45/745 (US);
H04L67/141 (EP,US);
H04L67/142 (EP,US);
H04L67/143 (EP,US);
H04L67/146 (EP,US);
H04L69/162 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] |
Former [2022/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TCP NETZWERKPAKETVERARBEITUNG | [2022/01] | English: | TCP NETWORK PACKET PROCESSING | [2022/01] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE PAQUETS DE RÉSEAU TCP | [2022/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 04.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17836172.1 / EP3481028 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006047839 (TATE PATRICK D [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XA]EP2323344 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1-3,7-9,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031] * * figure 3; claims 1-10 * [A] 4-6,10-12 |