EP4098568 - ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXOLAUNCH GmbH Kemperplatz 1 10785 Berlin / DE | [2024/11] |
Former [2022/49] | For all designated states EXOLAUNCH GmbH Reuchlinstrasse 10 10553 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOGDANOV, Dmitriy 10785 Berlin / DE | 02 /
SCHWARZ, Peter 5023 Salzburg / AT | 03 /
WIMMER, Peter 5452 Pfarrwerfen / AT | 04 /
GRUBER, Johannes 5020 Salzburg / AT | 05 /
* * * | 06 /
* * * | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21176976.5 | 31.05.2021 | [2022/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4098568 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4098568 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B64G1/64 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
B64G1/641 (EP,IL,KR);
A63C9/00 (IL);
B64G1/6457 (EP,KR);
B64G1/645 (IL,US);
B64G4/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] |
Former [2022/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSLÖSEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/49] | English: | ACTUATOR | [2022/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉCLENCHEMENT | [2022/49] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 24.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23208324.6 / EP4296172 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4682804 (PALMER WILLIAM B [US], et al); | [A]US5040748 (TORRE CHRISTOPHER N [US], et al); | [A]US5226617 (PANIN FABIO [NL]); | [AD]DE102016108606 (ECM SPACE TECH GMBH [DE]); | [A]CN110329552 (BEIJING WEIFEN HANGYU TECH CO LTD) | by applicant | DE102016108606 | WO2021089167 |