EP3919577 - PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawamura, Amane Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Shuhei Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 21177087.0 | 01.06.2021 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | JP20200097020 | 03.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020097020 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919577 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/21 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
C09J7/21 (EP,CN);
C08F220/1808 (EP);
C09J133/08 (EP);
C08K2201/019 (EP);
C09J2203/302 (EP);
C09J2301/124 (CN);
C09J2301/302 (EP,CN);
C09J2301/312 (EP);
C09J2301/41 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/1808, C08F220/14, C08F220/06, C08F220/06, C08F230/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKEMPFINDLICHES KLEBEBAND | [2021/49] | English: | PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE TAPE | [2021/49] | French: | BANDE ADHÉSIVE SENSIBLE À LA PRESSION | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/47] | 04.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1932892 (SCAPA FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 3 * abstract ** paragraph [0024] - paragraphs [0026] , [0053]; claims 1,11,13; tables 1,3 *; | [XY]JP2015105319 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] - paragraphs [0015] , [0023] , [0024] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0046]; example -; claims 1,3-6 * [Y] 3 | by applicant | JP2011016943 | JP2015040218 | JP2015218283 |